THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:12:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Glazier Medical Centre
Department of Family Medicine
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa Ontario L1H 2J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 579-1228
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Oct 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 20 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Hanna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hanna (CPSO#: 92174 )
Business Address: Glazier Medical Centre
Department of Family Medicine
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa Ontario L1H 2J9
(905) 579-1228

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Glazier Medical Centre
Department of Family Medicine
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa Ontario L1H 2J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 579-1228
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Oct 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 20 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Hanna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hanna (CPSO#: 92174 )
Business Address: Glazier Medical Centre
Department of Family Medicine
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa Ontario L1H 2J9
(905) 579-1228

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALBERT HANNA HENIN HANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANNA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALBERT HANNA HENIN HANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANNA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2009