THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:35:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Al Quds University, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Primary Care Diabetes Support Progr
346 Platt's Lane
London Ontario N6G 1J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6000
Extension: 67268
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Active Care Medical Centre
1807 Wonderland road north
London Ontario N6G 5C2
Phone: (519) 433-2996
Fax: (519) 433-4332
Address: 550 Wellington Rd
London Ontario N6C 5J1
Phone: 519-646-6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Dec 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mervat Bakeer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Feb 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bakeer (CPSO#: 92179 )
Business Address: 201 - 1807 Wonderland North
London Ontario N6G 5C2
(519) 433-4330
Business Address: 550 Wellington Rd.
London Ontario N6C 5J1
(519) 646-6100 Extn: 44027
Business Address: Primary Care Diabetes Support Program
346 Platt's Lane
London Ontario N6G 1J1
(519) 646-6000 Extn: 67268

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Al Quds University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Primary Care Diabetes Support Progr
346 Platt's Lane
London Ontario N6G 1J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6000
Extension: 67268
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Active Care Medical Centre
1807 Wonderland road north
London Ontario N6G 5C2
Phone: (519) 433-2996
Fax: (519) 433-4332
Address: 550 Wellington Rd
London Ontario N6C 5J1
Phone: 519-646-6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Dec 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mervat Bakeer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Feb 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bakeer (CPSO#: 92179 )
Business Address: 201 - 1807 Wonderland North
London Ontario N6G 5C2
(519) 433-4330
Business Address: 550 Wellington Rd.
London Ontario N6C 5J1
(519) 646-6100 Extn: 44027
Business Address: Primary Care Diabetes Support Program
346 Platt's Lane
London Ontario N6G 1J1
(519) 646-6000 Extn: 67268

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MERVAT BAKEER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKEER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MERVAT BAKEER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKEER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Al Quds University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Nov 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2009