THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:41:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Kazakh State Medical University, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, KANNADA, RUSSIAN, TAMIL, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oak Ridges Medical and Urgent Care
Centre
Suite 100
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 773-7759
Fax: (905) 773-1325

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Dec 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Asmitha Gangani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gangani (CPSO#: 92184 )
Business Address: Oak Ridges Medical and Urgent Care Centre
102 - 13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
(905) 773-7759

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, KANNADA, RUSSIAN, TAMIL, URDU
Medical School: Kazakh State Medical University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oak Ridges Medical and Urgent Care
Centre
Suite 100
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 773-7759
Fax: (905) 773-1325

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Dec 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Asmitha Gangani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gangani (CPSO#: 92184 )
Business Address: Oak Ridges Medical and Urgent Care Centre
102 - 13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
(905) 773-7759

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASMITHA GANGANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANGANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASMITHA GANGANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANGANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Kazakh State Medical University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Feb 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2009