THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:43:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Dept of Obstetrics & Gynaecology
Victory 4
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548 6069
Fax: 613 548 1330

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 29 Jul 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 29 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ashley Waddington Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Waddington (CPSO#: 92211 )
Business Address: 76 Stuart St
Victory 4
Kingston ON K7L 2V7

Corporation Name: Ashley Waddington Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Dec 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Dept of Obstetrics & Gynaecology
Victory 4
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548 6069
Fax: 613 548 1330

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 29 Jul 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 29 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ashley Waddington Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Waddington (CPSO#: 92211 )
Business Address: 76 Stuart St
Victory 4
Kingston ON K7L 2V7

Corporation Name: Ashley Waddington Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Dec 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASHLEY WADDINGTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WADDINGTON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASHLEY WADDINGTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WADDINGTON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Nov 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2009