THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 05:22:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Dec 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
South Huron Hospital Association Exeter
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: South Huron Hospital Association
LOCATION: Exeter

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ziada Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Ziada (CPSO#: 92249 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
Suite A10-202
London Ontario N6A 5A5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Dec 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
South Huron Hospital Association Exeter
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: South Huron Hospital Association
LOCATION: Exeter

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ziada Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Ziada (CPSO#: 92249 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
Suite A10-202
London Ontario N6A 5A5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZEINAB HAMDY ZIADA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZIADA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZEINAB HAMDY ZIADA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZIADA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Nov 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Feb 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 2009