THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:44:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 220
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6A 2C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 450-6105
Fax: (705) 450-6104

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adrienne M. Kelly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kelly (CPSO#: 92250 )
Business Address: #220-955 Queen St. E.
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6A 2C3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 220
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6A 2C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 450-6105
Fax: (705) 450-6104

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adrienne M. Kelly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kelly (CPSO#: 92250 )
Business Address: #220-955 Queen St. E.
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6A 2C3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADRIENNE MARGARET KELLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELLY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADRIENNE MARGARET KELLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELLY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Jan 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Jan 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 2009