THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:47:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Colombo, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALA

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1500 Fisher Street
Suite 203
North Bay Ontario P1B 2H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7054742106
Fax: 7054746613

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jan 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 09 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nilanga Abeysinghe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Mar 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Abeysinghe (CPSO#: 92265 )
Business Address: 203-1500 Fisher St
North Bay ON P1B 2H3
Business Address: 1500 Fisher St
Suite 203
North Bay ON P1B 2H3
7054742106

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALA
Medical School: University of Colombo, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1500 Fisher Street
Suite 203
North Bay Ontario P1B 2H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7054742106
Fax: 7054746613

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jan 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 09 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nilanga Abeysinghe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Mar 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Abeysinghe (CPSO#: 92265 )
Business Address: 203-1500 Fisher St
North Bay ON P1B 2H3
Business Address: 1500 Fisher St
Suite 203
North Bay ON P1B 2H3
7054742106

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NILANGA ABEYSINGHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABEYSINGHE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NILANGA ABEYSINGHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABEYSINGHE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Colombo, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Feb 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Feb 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 2009