THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 03:28:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Pennsylvania State University Coll of Me, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Walker Family Cancer Centre
1200 Fourth Ave.
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Cuthbert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Feb 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Cuthbert (CPSO#: 92267 )
Business Address: Walker Family Cancer Centre
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 682-6451

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Pennsylvania State University Coll of Me, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Walker Family Cancer Centre
1200 Fourth Ave.
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Cuthbert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Feb 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Cuthbert (CPSO#: 92267 )
Business Address: Walker Family Cancer Centre
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 682-6451

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ANTHONY CUTHBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUTHBERT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ANTHONY CUTHBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUTHBERT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Pennsylvania State University Coll of Me, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Dec 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 2009