THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:35:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Extension: 2370
Fax: (613) 738-4828

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lesleigh S. Abbott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Abbott (CPSO#: 92268 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Extension: 2370
Fax: (613) 738-4828

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lesleigh S. Abbott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Abbott (CPSO#: 92268 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LESLEIGH SELINA ABBOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABBOTT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LESLEIGH SELINA ABBOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABBOTT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Dec 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2009