THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 02:10:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Baskirian State Medical University, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2877A Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Health Network (SHN)
Centenary site
Shoniker Clinic
Toronto Ontario M1E 4C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-281-7301
Fax: 437-780-5562

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 03 May 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 03 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ruben Gagarin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gagarin (CPSO#: 92276 )
Business Address: 1520 Steeles Avenue West
Suite 101A
Vaughan Ontario L4K 3B9
Business Address: Rouge Valley Health System
Centenary Site
Shoniker Clinic
2877A Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4C1
(416) 281-7301

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN
Medical School: Baskirian State Medical University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2877A Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Health Network (SHN)
Centenary site
Shoniker Clinic
Toronto Ontario M1E 4C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-281-7301
Fax: 437-780-5562

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 03 May 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 03 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ruben Gagarin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gagarin (CPSO#: 92276 )
Business Address: 1520 Steeles Avenue West
Suite 101A
Vaughan Ontario L4K 3B9
Business Address: Rouge Valley Health System
Centenary Site
Shoniker Clinic
2877A Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4C1
(416) 281-7301

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUBEN GAGARIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAGARIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUBEN GAGARIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAGARIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Baskirian State Medical University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2009
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2009