THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:42:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Jordan Faculty of Medicine, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Radiology
1200 Main St W
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 75298
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 01 Jul 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Jordan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alnassar and Takrouri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Alnassar (CPSO#: 87135 ) Dr. H. Takrouri (CPSO#: 92281 )
Business Address: McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100

Corporation Name: Heba Takrouri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Dec 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Alnassar (CPSO#: 87135 ) Dr. H. Takrouri (CPSO#: 92281 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Jordan Faculty of Medicine, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Radiology
1200 Main St W
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 75298
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 01 Jul 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Jordan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alnassar and Takrouri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Alnassar (CPSO#: 87135 ) Dr. H. Takrouri (CPSO#: 92281 )
Business Address: McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100

Corporation Name: Heba Takrouri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Dec 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Alnassar (CPSO#: 87135 ) Dr. H. Takrouri (CPSO#: 92281 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
22 Mar 2019
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 22 2019
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Heba Sadeq Raba Takrouri may practise medicine independently in diagnostic
radiology.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Heba Sadeq Raba Takrouri may practise medicine independently in diagnostic
radiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Jordan Faculty of Medicine, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 22 Mar 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 22 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 22 Mar 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 May 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Feb 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2009