THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:28:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Aga Khan University, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4A-128 Queen St S
Queen Medical Centre
Mississauga ON L5M 1K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Unit 4A
128 Queen Street South
Mississauga Ontario L5M 1K8
Phone: (905) 997-7738
Fax: (905) 997-7714

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 09 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. A. Abdullah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Abdullah (CPSO#: 92285 )
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Address: 4A - 128 Queen Street South
Mississauga Ontario L5M 1K8
(905) 997-7712

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: Aga Khan University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4A-128 Queen St S
Queen Medical Centre
Mississauga ON L5M 1K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Unit 4A
128 Queen Street South
Mississauga Ontario L5M 1K8
Phone: (905) 997-7738
Fax: (905) 997-7714

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 09 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. A. Abdullah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Abdullah (CPSO#: 92285 )
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Address: 4A - 128 Queen Street South
Mississauga Ontario L5M 1K8
(905) 997-7712

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUKHSANA ASIF ABDULLAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDULLAH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUKHSANA ASIF ABDULLAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDULLAH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Aga Khan University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 2009