THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:37:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Niagara Health System
Walker Family Cancer Centre
1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2J 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 685-8082
Fax: (905) 682-3391

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David W Wasserman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jan 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wasserman (CPSO#: 92317 )
Business Address: Niagara Health System
St. Catharines Site
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2J 0A9
(905) 682-6451

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Niagara Health System
Walker Family Cancer Centre
1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2J 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 685-8082
Fax: (905) 682-3391

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David W Wasserman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jan 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wasserman (CPSO#: 92317 )
Business Address: Niagara Health System
St. Catharines Site
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2J 0A9
(905) 682-6451

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID WARREN WASSERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WASSERMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID WARREN WASSERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WASSERMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Jan 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 May 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Apr 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2009