THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 04:07:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Med Univ of Varna Dr. Paraskev Stoyanov, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
Emergency Department
47 Liberty Str South
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 623-3331
Extension: 21381
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nedalina Alexieva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Alexieva (CPSO#: 92398 )
Business Address: 47 Liberty Street South
Emergency Room
Clarington Ontario L1C 2N4
(905) 623-3331
Business Address: 1615 Dundas Stree East
Suite 17X
Durham Ontario L1N 2L1
(905) 240-6500
Business Address: 72 Whitehorn Cres
North York ON M2J 3B2
647-963-7373

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Med Univ of Varna Dr. Paraskev Stoyanov, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
Emergency Department
47 Liberty Str South
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 623-3331
Extension: 21381
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nedalina Alexieva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Alexieva (CPSO#: 92398 )
Business Address: 47 Liberty Street South
Emergency Room
Clarington Ontario L1C 2N4
(905) 623-3331
Business Address: 1615 Dundas Stree East
Suite 17X
Durham Ontario L1N 2L1
(905) 240-6500
Business Address: 72 Whitehorn Cres
North York ON M2J 3B2
647-963-7373

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEDALINA KANEVA ALEXIEVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALEXIEVA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEDALINA KANEVA ALEXIEVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALEXIEVA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 12 Jul 2017
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:

NOTE: All elements of this SCERP have been completed, effective July 3, 2019.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 12 Jul 2017
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:

NOTE: All elements of this SCERP have been completed, effective July 3, 2019.

Training

Medical School: Med Univ of Varna Dr. Paraskev Stoyanov, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Mar 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Mar 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2010