THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:26:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: #205
4256 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M3H 5Y8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-954-1030
Fax: 647-954-1073

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 14 Oct 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 14 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mittoo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mittoo (CPSO#: 92420 )
Business Address: 205-4256 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M3H 5Y8
(647) 954-1030

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: #205
4256 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M3H 5Y8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-954-1030
Fax: 647-954-1073

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 14 Oct 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 14 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mittoo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mittoo (CPSO#: 92420 )
Business Address: 205-4256 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M3H 5Y8
(647) 954-1030

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHIKHA MITTOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITTOO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHIKHA MITTOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITTOO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2010
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2010