THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/04/25 21:09:13 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Centre
Department of Anesthesia
100 Queensway Ave W
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 05 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Augustine Rhee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rhee (CPSO#: 92433 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Centre
Department of Anesthesia
100 Queensway Ave W
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 05 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Augustine Rhee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rhee (CPSO#: 92433 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AUGUSTINE YEUSOK RHEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RHEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AUGUSTINE YEUSOK RHEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RHEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Feb 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Feb 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jan 2010