THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:12:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingsbridge Medical Clinic
33 City Centre Drive
Suite 111
Mississauga Ontario L5B2N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 507-1111
Fax: (905) 890-7102

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
South Africa

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Anvari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Anvari (CPSO#: 92499 )
Business Address: 111-33 City Centre Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2N5
(905) 507-1111

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingsbridge Medical Clinic
33 City Centre Drive
Suite 111
Mississauga Ontario L5B2N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 507-1111
Fax: (905) 890-7102

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
South Africa

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Anvari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Anvari (CPSO#: 92499 )
Business Address: 111-33 City Centre Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2N5
(905) 507-1111

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINDA ANVARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANVARI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINDA ANVARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANVARI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2010
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2010