THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:58:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Doctors Urgent Care Family Medicine
15 - 1145 Morningside Avenue
Scarborough Ontario M1B 0A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 352-3621
Fax: (647) 352-3628
Address: Doctors Urgent Care Family Medicine
2860 Denison Street, Unit 101
Markham Ontario L3S 4T6
Phone: 905-554-0433
Fax: 905-554-0444

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Apr 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 06 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Medical Laboratory Technology Canada
PROFESSION: Medical Laboratory Technology
JURISDICTION: Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ali H. Ansari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Aug 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ansari (CPSO#: 92501 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Doctors Urgent Care Family Medicine
15 - 1145 Morningside Avenue
Scarborough Ontario M1B 0A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 352-3621
Fax: (647) 352-3628
Address: Doctors Urgent Care Family Medicine
2860 Denison Street, Unit 101
Markham Ontario L3S 4T6
Phone: 905-554-0433
Fax: 905-554-0444

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Apr 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 06 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Medical Laboratory Technology Canada
PROFESSION: Medical Laboratory Technology
JURISDICTION: Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ali H. Ansari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Aug 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ansari (CPSO#: 92501 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALI HASHSHAM ANSARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANSARI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALI HASHSHAM ANSARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANSARI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Aug 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2010