THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:27:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ahmadu Bello University, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 209-1525 Albion Rd
Etobicoke ON M9V 5G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167432229
Fax: 4167452572
Address: 106-222 Dixon Road
Etobicoke Ontario M9P 3S5
Phone: 416-850-8947
Fax: 416 745 2572
Address: CHILDREN'S WALK-IN CLINIC
209-1525 Albion Road
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 5G5
Phone: (416)243 2229
Fax: 416 245 2572
Address: 3885 Duke of York Blvd
Mississauga ON L5B 0E4
Phone: 9053664441
Fax: 9053664443

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 23 Jun 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador
USA - Indiana
USA - New Mexico
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Godwin Odumah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Odumah (CPSO#: 92510 )
Business Address: 209 - 1525 Albion Road
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 5G5
(416) 743-2229
Business Address: 7333 Goreway
Mississauga Ontario L4T 2T8
(905) 255-2504
Business Address: 107- 3885 Duke of York Boulevard
Mississauga Ontario L5B 3Z9
(905) 366-4441
Business Address: 620 Albion Road
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 4B4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ahmadu Bello University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 209-1525 Albion Rd
Etobicoke ON M9V 5G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167432229
Fax: 4167452572
Address: 106-222 Dixon Road
Etobicoke Ontario M9P 3S5
Phone: 416-850-8947
Fax: 416 745 2572
Address: CHILDREN'S WALK-IN CLINIC
209-1525 Albion Road
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 5G5
Phone: (416)243 2229
Fax: 416 245 2572
Address: 3885 Duke of York Blvd
Mississauga ON L5B 0E4
Phone: 9053664441
Fax: 9053664443

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 23 Jun 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador
USA - Indiana
USA - New Mexico
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Godwin Odumah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Odumah (CPSO#: 92510 )
Business Address: 209 - 1525 Albion Road
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 5G5
(416) 743-2229
Business Address: 7333 Goreway
Mississauga Ontario L4T 2T8
(905) 255-2504
Business Address: 107- 3885 Duke of York Boulevard
Mississauga Ontario L5B 3Z9
(905) 366-4441
Business Address: 620 Albion Road
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 4B4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GODWIN UNAMALU ODUMAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ODUMAH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GODWIN UNAMALU ODUMAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ODUMAH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ahmadu Bello University, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2010
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2010