THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 09:10:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Aligarh Muslim University, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
Division of Oncology
2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-6542
Fax: (905) 494-6416
Address: 101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Rolling Hills Dr
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
Phone: (519) 941-2410
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 May 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Hematology
Effective: 02 Feb 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Medical Oncology
Effective: 23 Feb 2010
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 09 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 02 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 23 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Husain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Mar 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Husain (CPSO#: 92518 )
Business Address: Headwaters Health Care Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
(519) 941-2410
Business Address: William Olser Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
Division of Oncology
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-6542
Business Address: William Osler Health Centre
Etobicoke General
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(905) 494-2120

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: Aligarh Muslim University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
Division of Oncology
2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-6542
Fax: (905) 494-6416
Address: 101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Rolling Hills Dr
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
Phone: (519) 941-2410
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 May 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Hematology
Effective: 02 Feb 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Medical Oncology
Effective: 23 Feb 2010
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 09 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 02 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 23 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Husain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Mar 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Husain (CPSO#: 92518 )
Business Address: Headwaters Health Care Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
(519) 941-2410
Business Address: William Olser Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
Division of Oncology
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-6542
Business Address: William Osler Health Centre
Etobicoke General
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(905) 494-2120

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
02 Feb 2012
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 02 2012
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Juhi Husain may practise medicine independently in Internal Medicine,
Medical Oncology and Haematology.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Juhi Husain may practise medicine independently in Internal Medicine,
Medical Oncology and Haematology.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Aligarh Muslim University, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 02 Feb 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 02 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 06 Aug 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 02 Feb 2012

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 02 Dec 2011

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2011

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Feb 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Feb 2010