THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:20:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Team Maple Walk-in Clinic
2200 Rutherford Road
Unit 101
Vaughan Ontario L4K 5V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 731-5535
Extension: 1
Fax: (905) 417-7888
Address: 103-191 McNaughton Rd E
York Major Walk-in Clinic
103
Maple ON L6A 4E2
Phone: 9057315535
Fax: 9054177888

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Feb 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 04 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mahreen Razzaq Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Razzaq (CPSO#: 92557 )
Business Address: Unit 101
2200 Rutherford Road
Vaughan Ontario L4K 5V2
(905) 731-5535

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: University of Karachi, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Team Maple Walk-in Clinic
2200 Rutherford Road
Unit 101
Vaughan Ontario L4K 5V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 731-5535
Extension: 1
Fax: (905) 417-7888
Address: 103-191 McNaughton Rd E
York Major Walk-in Clinic
103
Maple ON L6A 4E2
Phone: 9057315535
Fax: 9054177888

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Feb 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 04 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mahreen Razzaq Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Razzaq (CPSO#: 92557 )
Business Address: Unit 101
2200 Rutherford Road
Vaughan Ontario L4K 5V2
(905) 731-5535

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
15 Sep 2011
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 15 2011
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Mahreen Abdul Razzaq may practise medicine independently in family
medicine, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Mahreen Abdul Razzaq may practise medicine independently in family
medicine, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 27 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 Jul 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2010
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2011

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2011

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Mar 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Mar 2010