THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:00:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Government Medical College, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 306
18 Kensington Road
Brampton Ontario L6T 4S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 497-8558
Fax: 905-497-8559
Address: 312 Queen Street East
Brampton Ontario L6V 1C2
Phone: 905-458-7377
Fax: 905-458-7477

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Mar 2010
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 15 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H.P. Bajaj Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Bajaj (CPSO#: 92566 )
Business Address: 106 - 18 Kensington Road
Brampton Ontario L6T 1S5
(905) 497-8558
Business Address: 312 Queen Street East
Brampton Ontario L6V 1C2
(905) 458-7377

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Government Medical College, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 306
18 Kensington Road
Brampton Ontario L6T 4S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 497-8558
Fax: 905-497-8559
Address: 312 Queen Street East
Brampton Ontario L6V 1C2
Phone: 905-458-7377
Fax: 905-458-7477

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Mar 2010
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 15 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H.P. Bajaj Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Bajaj (CPSO#: 92566 )
Business Address: 106 - 18 Kensington Road
Brampton Ontario L6T 1S5
(905) 497-8558
Business Address: 312 Queen Street East
Brampton Ontario L6V 1C2
(905) 458-7377

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
06 Aug 2020
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 06 2020
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Harminder Pal Singh Bajaj may practise medicine independently in:

(i) primary care, excluding pediatrics, obstetrics and gynecology; and
(ii) adult chronic pain management.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Harminder Pal Singh Bajaj may practise medicine independently in:

(i) primary care, excluding pediatrics, obstetrics and gynecology; and
(ii) adult chronic pain management.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Government Medical College, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 06 Aug 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 22 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Nov 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 Jul 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 2012

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Nov 2011

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2010