THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:44:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Fac. de Med. 'Ibn El Jazzar' de Sousse, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 2018
33191 Hwy 17
Deep River ON K0J 1P0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 584 3238
Fax: 613 6708831
Address: 117 Banting Dr
Deep River ON K0J 1P0
Phone: 613 5843333
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 705 MacKay street
Pembroke Ontario K8A 1G8
Phone: (613) 732-2811
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

HOSPITAL: Deep River and District Hospital
LOCATION: Deep River

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ben Amor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Sep 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Ben Amor (CPSO#: 92578 )
Business Address: North Renfrew Family Health Team
117 Banting Drive
Deep River Ontario K0J 1P0
(613) 401-3118
Business Address: 705 MacKay Street
Pembroke Ontario K8A 1G8
(613) 401-3118
Business Address: 33191 Ontario 17
Deep River Ontario K0J 1P0
Business Address: Rr 1
FHO_Clinic
115-54 Ridge road
Deep River ON K0J 1P0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: Fac. de Med. 'Ibn El Jazzar' de Sousse, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 2018
33191 Hwy 17
Deep River ON K0J 1P0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 584 3238
Fax: 613 6708831
Address: 117 Banting Dr
Deep River ON K0J 1P0
Phone: 613 5843333
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 705 MacKay street
Pembroke Ontario K8A 1G8
Phone: (613) 732-2811
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

HOSPITAL: Deep River and District Hospital
LOCATION: Deep River

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ben Amor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Sep 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Ben Amor (CPSO#: 92578 )
Business Address: North Renfrew Family Health Team
117 Banting Drive
Deep River Ontario K0J 1P0
(613) 401-3118
Business Address: 705 MacKay Street
Pembroke Ontario K8A 1G8
(613) 401-3118
Business Address: 33191 Ontario 17
Deep River Ontario K0J 1P0
Business Address: Rr 1
FHO_Clinic
115-54 Ridge road
Deep River ON K0J 1P0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANENE BEN AMOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEN AMOR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANENE BEN AMOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEN AMOR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Fac. de Med. 'Ibn El Jazzar' de Sousse, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2010
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Mar 2010