THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:24:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Natal, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11-1107 Lorne Park Rd
Mississauga ON L5H 3A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052715717
Fax: 8332179886

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rughubir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Rughubir (CPSO#: 92601 )
Business Address: 11-1107 Lorne Park Rd
Mississauga ON L5H 3A1
9052715717

Corporation Name: Budhoo Rughubir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Aug 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS
Medical School: University of Natal, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11-1107 Lorne Park Rd
Mississauga ON L5H 3A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052715717
Fax: 8332179886

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rughubir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Rughubir (CPSO#: 92601 )
Business Address: 11-1107 Lorne Park Rd
Mississauga ON L5H 3A1
9052715717

Corporation Name: Budhoo Rughubir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Aug 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIRVASHNI RUGHUBIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUGHUBIR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIRVASHNI RUGHUBIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUGHUBIR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Natal, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2010
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2010