THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:06:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Zaporozhye State Medical University, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN, UKRAINIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Kayenta St
Stittsville ON K2S 2K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 13439991888
Fax: 13433080305

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 02 May 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 02 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Rusalovs'ka Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Sep 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rusalovs'ka (CPSO#: 92614 )
Business Address: 76 Kayenta St
Stittsville ON K2S 2K7
13439991888
Business Address: Suite 224
329 March Road
Kanata Ontario K2K 2E1
(613) 592-1001

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN, UKRAINIAN
Medical School: Zaporozhye State Medical University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Kayenta St
Stittsville ON K2S 2K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 13439991888
Fax: 13433080305

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 02 May 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 02 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Rusalovs'ka Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Sep 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rusalovs'ka (CPSO#: 92614 )
Business Address: 76 Kayenta St
Stittsville ON K2S 2K7
13439991888
Business Address: Suite 224
329 March Road
Kanata Ontario K2K 2E1
(613) 592-1001

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SVITLANA VITALIYIVNA RUSALOVS'KA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSALOVS'KA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SVITLANA VITALIYIVNA RUSALOVS'KA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSALOVS'KA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Zaporozhye State Medical University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 May 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 May 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2010