THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:40:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 210 Avenue P South
Saskatoon Saskatchewan S7M 2W2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 306-261-3483
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 103 Hospital Drive
Royal University Hospital
Divison of GIM. Department of Medicine.
GIM office 3rd floor
Saskatoon Saskatchewan S7N 0W8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 210 Avenue P South
Saskatoon Saskatchewan S7M 2W2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 306-261-3483
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 103 Hospital Drive
Royal University Hospital
Divison of GIM. Department of Medicine.
GIM office 3rd floor
Saskatoon Saskatchewan S7N 0W8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL ANDREW JOHN ZAWADOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAWADOWSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL ANDREW JOHN ZAWADOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAWADOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2025
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Apr 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Mar 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2010