THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:20:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: The University of Western Australia Faculty of Health and Medical Sciences, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Heart Institute
Room H-1295
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 696-7327
Fax: (613) 696-7359

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Cardiology
Effective: 17 Jun 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University of Ottawa Heart Institute Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sharon Chih Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chih (CPSO#: 92667 )
Business Address: 40 Ruskin St
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: The University of Western Australia Faculty of Health and Medical Sciences, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Heart Institute
Room H-1295
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 696-7327
Fax: (613) 696-7359

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Cardiology
Effective: 17 Jun 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University of Ottawa Heart Institute Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sharon Chih Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chih (CPSO#: 92667 )
Business Address: 40 Ruskin St
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
20 Feb 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 20 2025
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SHARON SHIAW YUN CHIH may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and cardiology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SHARON SHIAW YUN CHIH may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and cardiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: The University of Western Australia Faculty of Health and Medical Sciences, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 Feb 2025
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 Feb 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 19 Feb 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 Apr 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Feb 2025

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 Feb 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 Apr 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Apr 2010