THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 01:37:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ludwig Maximilian University at Munich, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
1 PMB 273
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Extension: 8593
Fax: (416) 340-3900

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 26 Apr 2010
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 26 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Germany

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wintersperger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Oct 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Wintersperger (CPSO#: 92681 )
Business Address: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
1 PMB 273
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
(416) 340-4800 Extn: 8593
Business Address: 3MC410
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5800
Business Address: 12th Floor
Breast Imaging
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 3113
Business Address: 76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 3113
Business Address: Unit 3-974
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-2000 Extn: 3442

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Apr 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN
Medical School: Ludwig Maximilian University at Munich, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
1 PMB 273
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Extension: 8593
Fax: (416) 340-3900

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 26 Apr 2010
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 26 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Germany

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wintersperger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Oct 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Wintersperger (CPSO#: 92681 )
Business Address: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
1 PMB 273
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
(416) 340-4800 Extn: 8593
Business Address: 3MC410
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5800
Business Address: 12th Floor
Breast Imaging
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 3113
Business Address: 76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 3113
Business Address: Unit 3-974
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-2000 Extn: 3442

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Apr 2017

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
06 Nov 2013
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 06 2013
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Bernd Juergen Wintersperger may practise medicine only,

(a) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical
Imaging, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Wintersperger holds an
academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(b) in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr.
Wintersperger no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Bernd Juergen Wintersperger may practise medicine only,

(a) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical
Imaging, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Wintersperger holds an
academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(b) in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr.
Wintersperger no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ludwig Maximilian University at Munich, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 06 Nov 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 06 Nov 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 2013

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Apr 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Apr 2010