THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:32:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 170 Emmett Avenue
West Park Healthcare Centre
Toronto Ontario M6M 2J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-243-3640
Extension: 2
Fax: 416-243-1177
Address: Children's Treatment Network
13175 Yonge St
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 0G6
Phone: (905) 773-4779
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Toronto Rehab - Rumsey Centre
345 Rumsey Road
Toronto Ontario M4G 1R7
Phone: 416-597-3422
Extension: 5370
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 150 Kilgour Road
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital
Toronto Ontario M4G 1R8
Phone: 416-425-6220
Extension: 3482
Fax: 416-424-3837

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Rumsey Centre Toronto
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Rumsey Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: West Park Healthcare Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Beverly Moylan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Moylan (CPSO#: 92757 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 170 Emmett Avenue
West Park Healthcare Centre
Toronto Ontario M6M 2J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-243-3640
Extension: 2
Fax: 416-243-1177
Address: Children's Treatment Network
13175 Yonge St
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 0G6
Phone: (905) 773-4779
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Toronto Rehab - Rumsey Centre
345 Rumsey Road
Toronto Ontario M4G 1R7
Phone: 416-597-3422
Extension: 5370
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 150 Kilgour Road
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital
Toronto Ontario M4G 1R8
Phone: 416-425-6220
Extension: 3482
Fax: 416-424-3837

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Rumsey Centre Toronto
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Rumsey Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: West Park Healthcare Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Beverly Moylan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Moylan (CPSO#: 92757 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BEVERLY AMANDA OUDKERK MOYLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOYLAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BEVERLY AMANDA OUDKERK MOYLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOYLAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Mar 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Mar 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010