THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:48:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-5145
Fax: 416-480-6002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Josee-Lyne Ethier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ethier (CPSO#: 92773 )
Business Address: Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ontario
25 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 5P9
(613) 549-6666 Extn: 6694
Business Address: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
KGH Site
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-3232

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-5145
Fax: 416-480-6002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Josee-Lyne Ethier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ethier (CPSO#: 92773 )
Business Address: Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ontario
25 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 5P9
(613) 549-6666 Extn: 6694
Business Address: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
KGH Site
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-3232

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEE-LYNE RENEE GISELE ETHIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ETHIER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEE-LYNE RENEE GISELE ETHIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ETHIER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010