THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:42:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 204
101 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B2P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-478-0778
Fax: 647-689-2017

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 03 Oct 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jaclyn Quirt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Mar 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Quirt (CPSO#: 92784 )
Business Address: 101 Queensway West
Suite 2-4
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2P7
Business Address: McMaster University
Department of Medicine
HSC3W11
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 73928

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 204
101 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B2P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-478-0778
Fax: 647-689-2017

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 03 Oct 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jaclyn Quirt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Mar 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Quirt (CPSO#: 92784 )
Business Address: 101 Queensway West
Suite 2-4
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2P7
Business Address: McMaster University
Department of Medicine
HSC3W11
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 73928

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACLYN ANN QUIRT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUIRT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACLYN ANN QUIRT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUIRT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 May 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010