THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/04/25 06:31:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Walkerville Medical Practice
2425 Tecumseh Rd E
Suite 106
Windsor Ontario N8W 1E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 254 5763
Fax: 519 997 3700

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 29 May 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stuart Bisland Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bisland (CPSO#: 92793 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Walkerville Medical Practice
2425 Tecumseh Rd E
Suite 106
Windsor Ontario N8W 1E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 254 5763
Fax: 519 997 3700

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 29 May 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stuart Bisland Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bisland (CPSO#: 92793 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STUART KENWARD BISLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BISLAND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STUART KENWARD BISLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BISLAND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010