THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:43:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queensway Health Centre
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto Ontario M9C 1A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-521-4090
Fax: 416-521-4116

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jason Kerr Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kerr (CPSO#: 92815 )
Business Address: Queensway Health Centre
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto Ontario M9C 1A5
(416) 521-4090
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queensway Health Centre
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto Ontario M9C 1A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-521-4090
Fax: 416-521-4116

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jason Kerr Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kerr (CPSO#: 92815 )
Business Address: Queensway Health Centre
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto Ontario M9C 1A5
(416) 521-4090
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON ROMERO KERR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KERR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON ROMERO KERR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KERR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010