THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:35:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: Saunders, Allison Jean (Used Until: 07 Jan 2013)
Medical School: McMaster University, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
167 Main St E, Grimsby, ON
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)945-2253
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 02 Nov 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Mar 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 02 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 21 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Allison Grice Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Apr 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Grice (CPSO#: 92834 )
Business Address: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
167 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P3
(905) 945-2253

General Information

Former Name: Saunders, Allison Jean (Used Until: 07 Jan 2013)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
167 Main St E, Grimsby, ON
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)945-2253
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 02 Nov 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Mar 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 02 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 21 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Allison Grice Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Apr 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Grice (CPSO#: 92834 )
Business Address: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
167 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P3
(905) 945-2253

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLISON JEAN GRICE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRICE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLISON JEAN GRICE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRICE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Mar 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Mar 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Mar 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010