THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 03:43:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1111 Medical Plaza Drive
Suite 250
The Woodlands Texas 77380
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1111 Medical Plaza Drive
Suit 250
The Woodlands Texas United States 77380
Phone: 2812968788
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 20 Feb 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 20 Feb 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Respirology
Effective: 20 Feb 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 20 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 20 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 20 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois
USA - Oklahoma
USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Al-Janabi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 May 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Al-Janabi (CPSO#: 92862 )

Corporation Name: Hasan Al-Janabi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Oct 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1111 Medical Plaza Drive
Suite 250
The Woodlands Texas 77380
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1111 Medical Plaza Drive
Suit 250
The Woodlands Texas United States 77380
Phone: 2812968788
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 20 Feb 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 20 Feb 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Respirology
Effective: 20 Feb 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 20 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 20 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 20 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois
USA - Oklahoma
USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Al-Janabi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 May 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Al-Janabi (CPSO#: 92862 )

Corporation Name: Hasan Al-Janabi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Oct 2019

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
20 Feb 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 20 2025
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. HASAN AHMAD AL-JANABI may practise medicine independently in internal medicine, critical care medicine, and respirology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. HASAN AHMAD AL-JANABI may practise medicine independently in internal medicine, critical care medicine, and respirology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2025
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 Nov 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Nov 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Feb 2025
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Feb 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2011

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2010