THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:38:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dorothy Ley Hospice
220 Sherway Dr
Etobicoke ON M9C 0A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 626-2138
Fax: (647)723-7554
Address: The Dorothy Ley Hospice
220 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 5N6
Phone: 416-626-2138
Fax: 647-723-7554
Address: Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway W
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: 905 848 7557
Fax: 647 723 7554

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Palliative Medicine
Effective: 25 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Palliative Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Justin Amitoj Chopra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chopra (CPSO#: 92865 )
Business Address: Trillium Health Partners
Division of Palliative Care
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
905 848 7557
Business Address: 200 Sherway Dr
The Dorothy Ley Hospice
Palliative Care Physicians
Etobicoke ON M9C 5N6
4166260116

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dorothy Ley Hospice
220 Sherway Dr
Etobicoke ON M9C 0A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 626-2138
Fax: (647)723-7554
Address: The Dorothy Ley Hospice
220 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 5N6
Phone: 416-626-2138
Fax: 647-723-7554
Address: Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway W
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: 905 848 7557
Fax: 647 723 7554

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Palliative Medicine
Effective: 25 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Palliative Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Justin Amitoj Chopra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chopra (CPSO#: 92865 )
Business Address: Trillium Health Partners
Division of Palliative Care
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
905 848 7557
Business Address: 200 Sherway Dr
The Dorothy Ley Hospice
Palliative Care Physicians
Etobicoke ON M9C 5N6
4166260116

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUSTIN AMITOJ CHOPRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOPRA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUSTIN AMITOJ CHOPRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOPRA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010