THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:06:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200-370 Bayview Dr
Bayview Family Medicine
Suite 200
Barrie ON L4N 7L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 315-2801
Fax: 705-722-7933

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Khodaei Thornton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khodaei (CPSO#: 92866 ) Dr. A. Thornton (CPSO#: 93641 )
Business Address: Royal Victoria Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 728-9090

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200-370 Bayview Dr
Bayview Family Medicine
Suite 200
Barrie ON L4N 7L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 315-2801
Fax: 705-722-7933

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Khodaei Thornton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khodaei (CPSO#: 92866 ) Dr. A. Thornton (CPSO#: 93641 )
Business Address: Royal Victoria Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 728-9090

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MINOO KHODAEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHODAEI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MINOO KHODAEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHODAEI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Nov 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010