THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:16:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd.
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3071
Fax: 519-663-3073

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Appleton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Appleton (CPSO#: 92886 )
Business Address: LHSC University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-3071

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd.
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3071
Fax: 519-663-3073

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Appleton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Appleton (CPSO#: 92886 )
Business Address: LHSC University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-3071

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW JAMES EDWARD APPLETON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. APPLETON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW JAMES EDWARD APPLETON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. APPLETON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010