THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:31:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Rosedale Medical Group
280 Queenston Road
Hamilton Ontario L8K 1H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 547-0508
Fax: (905) 547-6865

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ryan McLeod Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. R. McLeod (CPSO#: 92906 )
Business Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial
327 Reynolds Street
Oakville Ontario L6J 3L7
Business Address: Rosedale Medical Group
280 Queenston Road
Hamilton Ontario L8K 1H1
(905) 547-0508

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Rosedale Medical Group
280 Queenston Road
Hamilton Ontario L8K 1H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 547-0508
Fax: (905) 547-6865

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ryan McLeod Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. R. McLeod (CPSO#: 92906 )
Business Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial
327 Reynolds Street
Oakville Ontario L6J 3L7
Business Address: Rosedale Medical Group
280 Queenston Road
Hamilton Ontario L8K 1H1
(905) 547-0508

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RYAN MATTHEW MCLEOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLEOD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RYAN MATTHEW MCLEOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLEOD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010