THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:48:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-549-6666
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Wang (CPSO#: 92948 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Pathology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666 Extn: 7491

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-549-6666
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Wang (CPSO#: 92948 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Pathology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666 Extn: 7491

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAO WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAO WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010