THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/04/25 00:23:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 481
Manotick Ontario K4M 1A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 4256888
Fax: (613) 4255888
Address: 211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place Ontario K7C 1J4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Unit 4, 4188 Spratt Road
Ottawa Ontario K1V 0Z6
Phone: 6134256888
Fax: 6134255888
Address: 60 Cornelia St W
Smiths Falls Ontario K7A 2H9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 06 Oct 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jul 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 19 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Horace Yu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Yu (CPSO#: 92952 )
Business Address: 566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2C0
(613) 774-2420
Business Address: 60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls Ontario K7A 2H9
(613) 283-2330
Business Address: PO Box 481
Manotick Ontario K4M 1A5
(613) 714-9299
Business Address: 211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place Ontario K7C 1J4
(613) 257-2200
Business Address: 99 Kukulu Road
Kanata Ontario K2L 3C8
(613) 592-1448

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 481
Manotick Ontario K4M 1A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 4256888
Fax: (613) 4255888
Address: 211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place Ontario K7C 1J4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Unit 4, 4188 Spratt Road
Ottawa Ontario K1V 0Z6
Phone: 6134256888
Fax: 6134255888
Address: 60 Cornelia St W
Smiths Falls Ontario K7A 2H9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 06 Oct 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jul 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 19 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Horace Yu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Yu (CPSO#: 92952 )
Business Address: 566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2C0
(613) 774-2420
Business Address: 60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls Ontario K7A 2H9
(613) 283-2330
Business Address: PO Box 481
Manotick Ontario K4M 1A5
(613) 714-9299
Business Address: 211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place Ontario K7C 1J4
(613) 257-2200
Business Address: 99 Kukulu Road
Kanata Ontario K2L 3C8
(613) 592-1448

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HORACE YU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HORACE YU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010