THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:00:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 28 Oki Dr NW
Calgary AB T3B 6A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165056424
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1400 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8S 1C7
Phone: 4165056424
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mohamed Eltorki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Eltorki (CPSO#: 92975 )
Business Address: HHSC McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Pediatric Emergency Medicine
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 28 Oki Dr NW
Calgary AB T3B 6A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165056424
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1400 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8S 1C7
Phone: 4165056424
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mohamed Eltorki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Eltorki (CPSO#: 92975 )
Business Address: HHSC McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Pediatric Emergency Medicine
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMED MAHMOUD FAHMI ELTORKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELTORKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMED MAHMOUD FAHMI ELTORKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELTORKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Nov 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Apr 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010