THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:24:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Islamic Azad University, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 105-323 Wilson St E
Ancaster ON L9G 4A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056481112
Fax: 9056482033

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Refaie Shirpak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Apr 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Refaie Shirpak (CPSO#: 92976 )
Business Address: Suite 105
323 Wilson Street East
Ancaster Ontario L9G 4A8
(905) 648-1112

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Islamic Azad University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 105-323 Wilson St E
Ancaster ON L9G 4A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056481112
Fax: 9056482033

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Refaie Shirpak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Apr 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Refaie Shirpak (CPSO#: 92976 )
Business Address: Suite 105
323 Wilson Street East
Ancaster Ontario L9G 4A8
(905) 648-1112

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KHOSRO REFAIE SHIRPAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REFAIE SHIRPAK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KHOSRO REFAIE SHIRPAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REFAIE SHIRPAK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Islamic Azad University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jan 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010