THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:56:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 432 George Street North
Peterborough Ontario K9H 3R5
Phone: 705-741-3738
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 210 Wolfe Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 2K9
Phone: 7053134288
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rosemary Dell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Dell (CPSO#: 92994 )
Business Address: 360 George St N
Peterborough ON K9H 7E7
Business Address: Suite 302-2
159 King Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 2R8
(705) 749-9708
Business Address: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121
Business Address: 432 George St N
Peterborough ON K9H 3R5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 432 George Street North
Peterborough Ontario K9H 3R5
Phone: 705-741-3738
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 210 Wolfe Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 2K9
Phone: 7053134288
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rosemary Dell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Dell (CPSO#: 92994 )
Business Address: 360 George St N
Peterborough ON K9H 7E7
Business Address: Suite 302-2
159 King Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 2R8
(705) 749-9708
Business Address: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121
Business Address: 432 George St N
Peterborough ON K9H 3R5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROSEMARY DELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROSEMARY DELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010