THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 08:58:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Wellesley-St. James Town Health Centre
St. Michael's - Unity Health Toronto
95 Homewood Avenue
Toronto ON M4Y 2K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-3096
Fax: (416) 864-6035

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Owen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Mar 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Owen (CPSO#: 93015 )
Business Address: 95 Homewood Ave
Toronto ON M4Y 1J4
4168673728
Business Address: Health Centre at 410
4th Floor
410 Sherbourne Street
Toronto Ontario M4X 1K2
(416) 867-3728

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Wellesley-St. James Town Health Centre
St. Michael's - Unity Health Toronto
95 Homewood Avenue
Toronto ON M4Y 2K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-3096
Fax: (416) 864-6035

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Owen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Mar 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Owen (CPSO#: 93015 )
Business Address: 95 Homewood Ave
Toronto ON M4Y 1J4
4168673728
Business Address: Health Centre at 410
4th Floor
410 Sherbourne Street
Toronto Ontario M4X 1K2
(416) 867-3728

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES RICHARD MARK OWEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OWEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES RICHARD MARK OWEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OWEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010