THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:54:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Heart Institute
Dept. of Cardiac Anesthesiology
40 Ruskin Street - Room H2410
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 696-7381
Fax: (613) 696-7099
Address: Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
University of Ottawa Heart Institute Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brock J. Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Wilson (CPSO#: 93031 )
Business Address: Ottawa Heart Institute
Department of Cardiac Anesthesiology
Room H2410
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
(613) 696-7381

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Heart Institute
Dept. of Cardiac Anesthesiology
40 Ruskin Street - Room H2410
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 696-7381
Fax: (613) 696-7099
Address: Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
University of Ottawa Heart Institute Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brock J. Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Wilson (CPSO#: 93031 )
Business Address: Ottawa Heart Institute
Department of Cardiac Anesthesiology
Room H2410
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
(613) 696-7381

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BROCK JAMES ALLEN WILSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BROCK JAMES ALLEN WILSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010