THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:17:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1385 Bank St
Suite 425
Ottawa ON K1H 8N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6132336652
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Gautam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gautam (CPSO#: 93036 )
Business Address: 267 O'Connor Street
Suite 306
Ottawa Ontario K2P 1V3
(613) 233-6652

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1385 Bank St
Suite 425
Ottawa ON K1H 8N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6132336652
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Gautam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gautam (CPSO#: 93036 )
Business Address: 267 O'Connor Street
Suite 306
Ottawa Ontario K2P 1V3
(613) 233-6652

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHIVANI GAUTAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAUTAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHIVANI GAUTAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAUTAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Apr 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010