THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:14:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 202-275 Bagot St
Kingston ON K7L 3G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-7477
Fax: (613) 344-2089

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Care Centre Kingston
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Gemmill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gemmill (CPSO#: 93065 )
Business Address: 220 Bagot Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5E9
(613) 533-9303
Business Address: 202-275 Bagot St
Cornerstone Medical Clinic
Kingston Family Health Team
Kingston ON K7L 3G4
613-549-7477

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 202-275 Bagot St
Kingston ON K7L 3G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-7477
Fax: (613) 344-2089

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Care Centre Kingston
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Gemmill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gemmill (CPSO#: 93065 )
Business Address: 220 Bagot Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5E9
(613) 533-9303
Business Address: 202-275 Bagot St
Cornerstone Medical Clinic
Kingston Family Health Team
Kingston ON K7L 3G4
613-549-7477

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARGARET GEMMILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEMMILL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARGARET GEMMILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEMMILL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010