THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:39:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: Gupta, Sonilla (Used Until: 08 Oct 2012)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Jane Furber Clinic
150 Strickland Street
Lakefield Ontario K0L 2H0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-651-5000
Fax: 705-651-5002
Address: Guardian Townline Pharmacy
10A-1414 King St East
Courtice
Courtice Ontario L1E2B1
Phone: 9057218828
Fax: 9057218801

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sonilla Majeed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Majeed (CPSO#: 93069 )
Business Address: 4-150 Strickland St
Douro-Dummer ON K0L 2H0
7056515000
Business Address: B7 - 2727 Courtice Road
Courtice Ontario L1E 3A2
(905) 233-1919

General Information

Former Name: Gupta, Sonilla (Used Until: 08 Oct 2012)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Jane Furber Clinic
150 Strickland Street
Lakefield Ontario K0L 2H0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-651-5000
Fax: 705-651-5002
Address: Guardian Townline Pharmacy
10A-1414 King St East
Courtice
Courtice Ontario L1E2B1
Phone: 9057218828
Fax: 9057218801

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sonilla Majeed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Majeed (CPSO#: 93069 )
Business Address: 4-150 Strickland St
Douro-Dummer ON K0L 2H0
7056515000
Business Address: B7 - 2727 Courtice Road
Courtice Ontario L1E 3A2
(905) 233-1919

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SONILLA MAJEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAJEED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SONILLA MAJEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAJEED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010