THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:00:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Minto Place
Main Atrium
407 Laurier Ave W
Unit 4
Ottawa Ontario K1R 7Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 702-5371
Fax: (613) 702-0490
Address: 407 Laurier Ave West
Unit 4
Ottawa Ontario K1R 7Y7
Phone: 6137025371
Fax: 3438882147

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Levenstadt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Dec 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Levenstadt (CPSO#: 93078 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Minto Place
Main Atrium
407 Laurier Ave W
Unit 4
Ottawa Ontario K1R 7Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 702-5371
Fax: (613) 702-0490
Address: 407 Laurier Ave West
Unit 4
Ottawa Ontario K1R 7Y7
Phone: 6137025371
Fax: 3438882147

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Levenstadt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Dec 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Levenstadt (CPSO#: 93078 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEREMY STEPHEN LEVENSTADT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVENSTADT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEREMY STEPHEN LEVENSTADT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVENSTADT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010